This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2021 at 04:29:13 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SCHOOL OF THEOLOGY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA CLAREMONT SCHOOL OF THEOLOGY VS THE CLAREMONT COLLEGES, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SCHOOL OF THEOLOGY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA CLAREMONT SCHOOL OF THEOLOGY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against THE CLAREMONT COLLEGES, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0241

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SCHOOL OF THEOLOGY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA CLAREMONT SCHOOL OF THEOLOGY

Defendant

THE CLAREMONT COLLEGES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLARK CHARLES

Defendant Attorneys

ROHRER PAUL MARK

FRIEDMAN DANIEL J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • Hearing08/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • Hearing08/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Hearing06/22/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by The Claremont Colleges, Inc. a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by The Claremont Colleges, Inc. a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Southern California School of Theology, a California corporation dba Claremont School of Theology (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Southern California School of Theology, a California corporation dba Claremont School of Theology (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Southern California School of Theology, a California corporation dba Claremont School of Theology (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Southern California School of Theology, a California corporation dba Claremont School of Theology (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SCHOOL OF THEOLOGY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA CLAREMONT SCHOOL OF THEOLOGY is a litigant

Latest cases where CLAREMONT GRADUATE UNIVERSITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLARK CHARLES