This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/03/2022 at 08:13:08 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP VS KUMMINS, ADAM

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against KUMMINS, ADAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREENE, VICKI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3337

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREENE, VICKI

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP

Respondent

KUMMINS ADAM

Other

REES GAYLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

REIS SEAN PATRICK

 

Court Documents

Petition - Workplace Violence (violence)

6/6/2022: Petition - Workplace Violence (violence)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

6/6/2022: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

6/6/2022: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

6/6/2022: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

6/23/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Proof of Service

6/21/2022: Proof of Service

Minute Order

6/24/2022: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 13, Greene, Vicki, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130) (emailed 6/27/22 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Employee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketPetition - Workplace Violence (violence); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reis, Sean P