This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2022 at 06:22:15 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP VS HARDINE, RUSSELL

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against HARDINE, RUSSELL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are COHEN, LAURA and ABRAMOWITZ, AARON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2947

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

COHEN, LAURA

ABRAMOWITZ, AARON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP

Respondent

HARDINE RUSSELL

Other

KEYSE KENDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

REIS SEAN PATRICK

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - Workplace Violence (non-violence)

5/17/2022: Petition - Workplace Violence (non-violence)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

5/17/2022: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

5/17/2022: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

6/7/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

6/7/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/28/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

5/17/2022: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

6/28/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • Hearing07/20/2022 at 8:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 94, Cohen, Laura, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 94, Abramowitz, Aaron, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketPetition - Workplace Violence (non-violence); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reis, Sean P