This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/04/2023 at 05:11:01 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., A CALIFORNIA COMPANY, ET AL. VS HOOPER HEALTHCARE CONSULTING, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/28/2023 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC , A CALIFORNIA COMPANY, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HOOPER HEALTHCARE CONSULTING, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA K SEPE-WIESENFELD and MARK H. EPSTEIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1347

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA K SEPE-WIESENFELD

MARK H. EPSTEIN

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ALTA LOS ANGELES HOSPITALS INC. A CALIFORNIA COMPANY

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC. A CALIFORNIA COMPANY DBA SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL AT CULVER CITY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

HOOPER HEALTHCARE CONSULTING LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RHOW EKWAN ERIC

PANCHAPAKESAN GOPI KRISHNA

Defendant Attorney

LUDWIG MITCHELL BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order Re Reservation of Jurisdiction Pursuant to CCP section 664.6

11/30/2023: Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order Re Reservation of Jurisdiction Pursuant to CCP section 664.6

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

11/1/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Notice of Settlement

10/31/2023: Notice of Settlement

Cross-Complaint

10/18/2023: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/17/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/17/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/17/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/3/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation to Stay Case and Proposed Order

6/30/2023: Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation to Stay Case and Proposed Order

Notice (name extension) Notice Notice of Court Order

4/7/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice Notice of Court Order

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer [170.6]) of 04/03/2023

4/3/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer [170.6]) of 04/03/2023

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer [170.6])

4/3/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer [170.6])

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

3/30/2023: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

3/28/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

3/28/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/28/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/28/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Summons on Complaint

3/28/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/01/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 01/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department I Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/01/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees; by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., a California company, et al. on 03/28/2023, entered Order for Dismissal with prejudice as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2023

DocketStipulation and Order Re Reservation of Jurisdiction Pursuant to CCP section 664.6; Signed and Filed by: HOOPER HEALTHCARE CONSULTING, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); As to: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., a California company (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2023

DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Re Reservation of Jurisdiction Pursuant to CCP section 664.6: Filed By: HOOPER HEALTHCARE CONSULTING, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 11/30/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 01/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department I

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023

DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department I updated: Result Date to 11/01/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023

DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., a California company (Plaintiff); ALTA LOS ANGELES HOSPITALS, INC., a California company (Plaintiff); ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023

DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: HOOPER HEALTHCARE CONSULTING, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); As to: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., a California company (Plaintiff); ALTA LOS ANGELES HOSPITALS, INC., a California company (Plaintiff); ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
03/29/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department N Santa Monica Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., a California company (Plaintiff); ALTA LOS ANGELES HOSPITALS, INC., a California company (Plaintiff); ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: HOOPER HEALTHCARE CONSULTING, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., a California company (Plaintiff); ALTA LOS ANGELES HOSPITALS, INC., a California company (Plaintiff); ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: HOOPER HEALTHCARE CONSULTING, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., a California company (Plaintiff); ALTA LOS ANGELES HOSPITALS, INC., a California company (Plaintiff); ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: HOOPER HEALTHCARE CONSULTING, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less