This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2022 at 13:16:38 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY VS W.A. RASIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/29/2022 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against W A RASIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8005

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

Defendants

ROWLAND WATER DISTRICT

W.A. RASIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOURAFCHAN JENUS K.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/29/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

8/29/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

8/29/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/29/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff); As to: W.A. Rasic Construction Company, Inc. (Defendant); Rowland Water District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff); As to: W.A. Rasic Construction Company, Inc. (Defendant); Rowland Water District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff); As to: W.A. Rasic Construction Company, Inc. (Defendant); Rowland Water District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where W.A. RASIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOURAFCHAN JENUS K. ESQ.