This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2023 at 01:12:59 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY VS STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A PUBLIC ENTITY

Case Summary

On 02/10/2023 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0642

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

Defendant

STATE OF CALIFORNIA ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOURAFCHAN JENUS K.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/10/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/10/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/10/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/10/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/15/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

4/4/2023: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2023
  • Hearing06/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff); As to: State of California, acting by and through the Department of Transportation, a Public Entity (Defendant); Service Date: 04/03/2023; Service Cost: 190.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Shirley K. Watkins in Department T Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff); As to: State of California, acting by and through the Department of Transportation, a Public Entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff); As to: State of California, acting by and through the Department of Transportation, a Public Entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff); As to: State of California, acting by and through the Department of Transportation, a Public Entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less