This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 08:10:51 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY VS MARIA CORNEJO ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/16/2017 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARIA CORNEJO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4363

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

Defendants and Respondents

CORNEJO MARIA

CORNEJO NATALIE

DOE 1 DRIVER

CORNEJO DANIEL

CORNEJO RONNIE

DOES 2 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

NOURAFCHAN JENUS K. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JENUS K. NOURAFCHAN

9/13/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JENUS K. NOURAFCHAN

Minute Order

9/13/2018: Minute Order

Motion to Compel

11/9/2018: Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

11/9/2018: Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

11/9/2018: Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

11/9/2018: Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

11/9/2018: Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

11/9/2018: Motion to Compel

Minute Order

1/2/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

1/7/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

1/15/2019: Notice of Ruling

Request for Dismissal

3/27/2019: Request for Dismissal

Motion for Order

3/28/2019: Motion for Order

Request for Dismissal

5/2/2019: Request for Dismissal

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

3/16/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/3/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

4/28/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

4/28/2017: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions; Hearing on Motio...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Motion for Order (Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Imposing Terminating and Monetary Sanctions Against Defendant Daniel Cornejo for Failure to Obey Court Orders; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Jenus K. Nourafchan in Support Thereof); Filed by Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Motion for Order (Imposing Terminating and Monetary Sanctions Against Defendant Ronnie Cornejo for Failure to Obey Court Order; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Jenus K. Nourafchan in Support Thereof); Filed by Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2017
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC654363    Hearing Date: November 04, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

MARIA CORNEJO, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC654363

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

October 18, 2019

Plaintiff, Southern California Gas Company filed this action against Defendants, Maria, Ronnie, Daniel, and Natalie Cornejo to recover workers’ compensation benefits and property damage incurred as a result of an automobile accident. Defendants are alleged to be the owners, operators, etc. of the vehicle that caused the accident.

On 3/27/19, Plaintiff dismissed Maria and Natalie Cornejo from the complaint.

On 5/02/19, the Court imposed terminating sanctions against Daniel and Ronnie Cornejo. The same day, Plaintiff dismissed Does 1-25. On 5/10/19, at Plaintiff’s request, the Clerk entered default against Daniel and Ronnie Cornejo.

At this time, Plaintiff seeks entry of default judgment against Daniel and Ronnie Cornejo. The request is denied without prejudice for the following reasons:

· The request for default judgment is not accompanied by any declaration or evidence in support of the request for judgment. CRC 3.1800(a)(2);

· Plaintiff seeks to recover $42,445.37 jointly and severally against both defendants. It is not clear from the complaint which of the sued defendants was driving the vehicle at issue, but it is clear that only one of them could have been driving. The vehicle owner’s liability is limited to $5,000 for property damage, plus $15,000 for personal injury to one person. Vehicle Code §17151(a). Plaintiff must limit the request for damages against any person sued only for owning the vehicle, as opposed to driving the vehicle, accordingly. This must be clarified by way of the required declaration, discussed above.

Dated this 18th day of October, 2019

Hon. Jon Takasugi

Judge of the Superior Court