This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2022 at 02:33:15 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY VS ANTONIO JIMENEZ

Case Summary

On 08/30/2022 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ANTONIO JIMENEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8694

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

Defendant

JIMENEZ ANTONIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOURAFCHAN JENUS KHORSANDI

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/30/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

8/30/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/30/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/30/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/30/2022: Complaint

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/15/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/15/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/15/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2023
  • Hearing01/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • Hearing01/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 58

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 58

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Bruce G. Iwasaki in Department 58 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff); As to: Antonio Jimenez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff); As to: Antonio Jimenez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Southern California Gas Company (Plaintiff); As to: Antonio Jimenez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOURAFCHAN JENUS K. ESQ.