This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/03/2021 at 08:52:52 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY VS VIEWMONT INVESTMENTS

Case Summary

On 01/10/2018 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VIEWMONT INVESTMENTS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9366

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Defendants

VIEWMONT INVESTMENTS LLC

LEON KROUS DRILLING INC

DWELLING CONSTRUCTION INC

SUPERIOR QUALITY CONSTRUCTION INC

MUELLER MICHAEL

PERAZZOLO INC. DBA ELITE CONTRACTING AKA ELITE DEMOLITION AND HAULING

ELITE DEMOLITION AND HAULING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BARASH SHULA ROTH

NOURAFCHAN JENUS KHORSANDI ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

CURD JOSEPH D.

HOLLINS ANDREW STEWART

CROSSIN PETER HUGH

ORLAND JAMES J

WEINSTEIN MARK ALAN

WEINSTEIN MARK ALAN ESQ.

LABRUSCIANO TRACY E.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KIBEL ERIC NEIL

Cross Defendant Attorneys

BAKER SHEILA ARLENE

PORTER CLARA L.

HUSSAIN MUHAMMED TALAL

REIMERS ETHAN A.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - OF CROSS COMPLAINT, SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

10/19/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - OF CROSS COMPLAINT, SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

11/29/2018: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

11/29/2018: Answer

Answer

12/17/2018: Answer

Answer

12/17/2018: Answer

Answer

12/21/2018: Answer

Answer

12/21/2018: Answer

Cross-Complaint

1/3/2019: Cross-Complaint

Request for Judicial Notice

1/3/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

Separate Statement

1/3/2020: Separate Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BERNHARD BIHR

1/3/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BERNHARD BIHR

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RONNIE BAKER

1/3/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RONNIE BAKER

Motion for Summary Adjudication

1/3/2020: Motion for Summary Adjudication

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/3/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Opposition - OPPOSITION OF LEON KROUS DRILLING TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DWELLING CONSTRUCTION, INC.

2/19/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION OF LEON KROUS DRILLING TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DWELLING CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Separate Statement

2/19/2020: Separate Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LEON KROUS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DWELLING CONSTRUCTION, INC.

2/19/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LEON KROUS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DWELLING CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Request for Judicial Notice

3/5/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

148 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • Hearing03/14/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • Hearing03/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • Hearing01/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF NON-OPPOSITION TO LEON KROUS DRILLING, INC.?S APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION); Filed by Leon Krous Drilling Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Defendants Viewmont Investmonts LLC and Michael Mueller's Failure To Appear Up To And Including Potential Terminating Sanctions) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DIRECTED TO DEFENDANTS VIEWMONT INVESTMENTS, LLC AND MICHAEL MUELLER); Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
219 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketANSWER PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

glu¢/ 104

(818) 789-4273 CA 91403-2373

Attorney for Defendant LEON KROUS DRILLING, INC.

Su erlor Coun of Californi ounty of Los Angeles @

APR 26 2018

Gomez Deputy

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON

COMPANY,

Plaintiff, V.

VIEWMONT INVESTMENTS, LLC et al.,

Defendants.

PROOF

Case No. BC689366 D-2¢

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CROSS-

COMPLAINT, SUMMONS ON

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VIEWMONT INVESTMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PERAZZOLO INC is a litigant

Latest cases where LEON KROUS DRILLING INC. is a litigant