This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/23/2019 at 05:30:00 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY VS SULLY MILLER CONTRACTI

Case Summary

On 04/23/2018 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SULLY MILLER CONTRACTI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3483

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Defendants

SULLY-MILLER CONTRACTING COMPANY

TORRANCE CITY OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVY NAZILA Y. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

YOKA & SMITH LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

9/26/2019: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/26/2019

9/26/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/26/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Request for Dismissal

10/8/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/21/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/20/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/23/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

7/25/2018: Minute Order -

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

7/25/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

DEFENDANTS, SULLY-MILLER CONTRACTING COMPANY AND GITY OF TORRANCE'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

7/26/2018: DEFENDANTS, SULLY-MILLER CONTRACTING COMPANY AND GITY OF TORRANCE'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

7/26/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/31/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS, SULLY-MILLER CONTRACTING COMPANY AND CITY OF TORRANCE TO SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S COMPLAINT

5/31/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS, SULLY-MILLER CONTRACTING COMPANY AND CITY OF TORRANCE TO SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/21/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

5/8/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/8/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS -

4/23/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

4/23/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Docketat 09:54 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Sully-Miller Contracting Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/26/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANTS, SULLY-MILLER CONTRACTING COMPANY AND GITY OF TORRANCE'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANTS, SULLY-MILLER CONTRACTING COMPANY AND CITY OF TORRANCE TO SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SULLY-MILLER CONTRACTING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where TORRANCE CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVY NAZILA Y. ESQ.