This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/06/2021 at 16:03:01 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY VS STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0257

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Defendants

SECURITY PAVING COMPANY INC.

STATE OF CALIFORNIA ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVY NAZILA

Defendant Attorney

JOHNSON THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Answer

7/23/2021: Answer

Answer

5/28/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/29/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/5/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2024
  • Hearing04/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • Hearing06/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • Hearing06/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by The People of the State of California , acting by and through the Department of Transportation Erroneously Sued As State of California, Acting By and Through the Department of Transportation, a Public Entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Security Paving Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECURITY PAVING COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVY NAZILA Y. ESQ.