This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2023 at 19:20:41 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY VS S&B CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against S B CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2346

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

CULVER CITY A PUBLIC ENTITY

HP COMMUNICATIONS INC.

S&B CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC.

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOURAFCHAN JENUS K.

Defendant Attorneys

DEAGON JOHN

KAIMAN BARRY G.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/10/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/17/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/17/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/6/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/7/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/8/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/29/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

12/29/2022: Answer

Request for Dismissal

1/25/2023: Request for Dismissal

Answer

3/6/2023: Answer

Cross-Complaint

3/6/2023: Cross-Complaint

Request for Dismissal

3/13/2023: Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketDismissal entered on 01/25/2023, as to entire action is Vacated - Need to add cross complaint.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Culver City, a Public Entity (Cross-Complainant); As to: Roes 1 through 50, inclusive (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by Culver City, a Public Entity on 03/06/2023, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Culver City, a Public Entity as to Roes 1 through 50, inclusive

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Culver City, a Public Entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Cross-Complaint: As To Parties changed from Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff) to Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Culver City, a Public Entity (Defendant); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Culver City, a Public Entity (Defendant); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Southern California Edison Company on 11/10/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Southern California Edison Company as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff); As to: S&B Construction Services, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/05/2022; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff); As to: HP Communications, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/03/2022; Service Cost: 82.40; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine W. Mandel in Department P Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff); As to: S&B Construction Services, Inc. (Defendant); HP Communications, Inc. (Defendant); Culver City, a Public Entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff); As to: S&B Construction Services, Inc. (Defendant); HP Communications, Inc. (Defendant); Culver City, a Public Entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff); As to: S&B Construction Services, Inc. (Defendant); HP Communications, Inc. (Defendant); Culver City, a Public Entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less