This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2021 at 04:40:38 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY VS JK COMMUNICATIONS AND CONSTRUCTION, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2020 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JK COMMUNICATIONS AND CONSTRUCTION, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3749

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Defendants

HP COMMUNICATIONS INC.

JK COMMUNICATIONS AND CONSTRUCTION INC. DBA KLEVEN CONSTRUCTION

CULVER CITY A PUBLIC ENTITY

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

JK COMMUNICATIONS AND CONSTRUCTION INC. DBA KLEVEN CONSTRUCTION

Cross Defendant

UTILIQUEST LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOURAFCHAN JENUS

Defendant Attorney

LUHRING SUSAN ELIZABETH

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

EDIC WILLIAM S

Cross Defendant Attorney

SLAUGHTER WILLIAM MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/5/2021: Request for Dismissal

Substitution of Attorney

4/9/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING

1/6/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING

Notice of Related Case

12/9/2020: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case

12/11/2020: Notice of Related Case

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/23/2020

12/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/23/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/29/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/29/2020: Answer

Cross-Complaint

9/29/2020: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/29/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

9/29/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

9/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

8/14/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

7/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/22/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/17/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

7/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by JK Communications and Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Culver City, a Public Entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Ruling); Filed by Utiliquest, LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • Docketat 3:11 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/23/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Utiliquest, LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Utiliquest, LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Utiliquest, LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Culver City, a Public Entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less