This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/01/2023 at 07:00:53 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY VS JACK SILVERMAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against JACK SILVERMAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6554

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Interpleaders

ENGSTROM LIPSCOMB & LACK

HOWARTH & SMITH

SANDOVAL MARIEL

SANDOVAL STELLA

SILVERMAN CLARA

SILVERMAN JACK

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interpleader Attorneys

SMITH ARCHIBALD M.

WHALEN DANIEL CHARLES

DIXON DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

Complaint in Interpleader

11/18/2022: Complaint in Interpleader

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/18/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/18/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/18/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/29/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/29/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/29/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/29/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Related Case

12/1/2022: Notice of Related Case

Answer - ANSWER TO SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER BY DEFENDANTS IN INTERPLEADER

12/1/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER BY DEFENDANTS IN INTERPLEADER

Declaration of Mailing

12/2/2022: Declaration of Mailing

Response - RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

12/2/2022: Response - RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

Notice - NOTICE OF HOWARTH & SMITH'S RESPONSE TO JACK SILVERMAN, CLARA SILVERMAN, AND MARIEL SANDOVAL'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

12/19/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF HOWARTH & SMITH'S RESPONSE TO JACK SILVERMAN, CLARA SILVERMAN, AND MARIEL SANDOVAL'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT HOWARTH & SMITH TO COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER; PROOF OF SERVICE

12/21/2022: Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT HOWARTH & SMITH TO COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER; PROOF OF SERVICE

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2023
  • Hearing04/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • Hearing04/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketAnswer OF DEFENDANT HOWARTH & SMITH TO COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER; PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed by: HOWARTH & SMITH (Defendant in Interpleader)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Howarth & Smith's Response to Jack Silverman, Clara Silverman, and Mariel Sandoval's Notice of Related Case; Filed by: HOWARTH & SMITH (Defendant in Interpleader); As to: HOWARTH & SMITH (Defendant in Interpleader)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Related Case: Filed By: STELLA SANDOVAL (Defendant in Interpleader),ENGSTROM, LIPSCOMB & LACK (Defendant in Interpleader),CLARA SILVERMAN (Defendant in Interpleader),JACK SILVERMAN (Defendant in Interpleader),MARIEL SANDOVAL (Defendant in Interpleader); Result: Reviewed - No Action Required ; Result Date: 12/05/2022 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketResponse in Opposition to Notice of Related Cases; Filed by: HOWARTH & SMITH (Defendant in Interpleader)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Mailing; Filed by: JACK SILVERMAN (Defendant in Interpleader); CLARA SILVERMAN (Defendant in Interpleader); MARIEL SANDOVAL (Defendant in Interpleader); STELLA SANDOVAL (Defendant in Interpleader); ENGSTROM, LIPSCOMB & LACK (Defendant in Interpleader)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketAnswer TO SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER BY DEFENDANTS IN INTERPLEADER; Filed by: JACK SILVERMAN (Defendant in Interpleader); CLARA SILVERMAN (Defendant in Interpleader); MARIEL SANDOVAL (Defendant in Interpleader); STELLA SANDOVAL (Defendant in Interpleader); ENGSTROM, LIPSCOMB & LACK (Defendant in Interpleader)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: JACK SILVERMAN (Defendant in Interpleader); CLARA SILVERMAN (Defendant in Interpleader); MARIEL SANDOVAL (Defendant in Interpleader); STELLA SANDOVAL (Defendant in Interpleader); ENGSTROM, LIPSCOMB & LACK (Defendant in Interpleader)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Daniel Charles Whalen (Attorney): Middle Name changed from C. to Charles

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 26 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint in Interpleader; Filed by: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: JACK SILVERMAN (Defendant); CLARA SILVERMAN (Defendant); MARIEL SANDOVAL (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: JACK SILVERMAN (Defendant); CLARA SILVERMAN (Defendant); MARIEL SANDOVAL (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: JACK SILVERMAN (Defendant); CLARA SILVERMAN (Defendant); MARIEL SANDOVAL (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENGSTROM LIPSCOMB AND LACK is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIXON ESQ DOUGLAS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHALEN DANIEL C.