This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2023 at 02:39:07 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY VS ELECNOR BELCO ELECTRIC, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ELECNOR BELCO ELECTRIC, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2942

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Defendants

CITY OF HAWTHORNE A PUBLIC ENTITY

ELECNOR BELCO ELECTRIC INC.

MARTINEZ SALVADOR

SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION DBA SHAWNAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOURAFCHAN JENUS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/7/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

10/7/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

10/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/5/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

1/19/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Southern California Edison Company on 09/07/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Southern California Edison Company as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff); As to: Sialic Contractors Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/04/2021; Service Cost: 82.66; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff); As to: City of Hawthorne, a Public Entity (Defendant); Service Date: 10/25/2021; Service Cost: 79.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff); As to: Elecnor Belco Electric, Inc. (Defendant); Sialic Contractors Corporation (Defendant); Salvador Martinez (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff); As to: Elecnor Belco Electric, Inc. (Defendant); Sialic Contractors Corporation (Defendant); Salvador Martinez (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff); As to: Elecnor Belco Electric, Inc. (Defendant); Sialic Contractors Corporation (Defendant); Salvador Martinez (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less