This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2019 at 01:56:35 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY VS E & R CONSTRUCTION INC

Case Summary

On 02/02/2018 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against E R CONSTRUCTION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2738

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Defendants

CHALMERS CORPORATION

E&R CONSTRUCTION INC.

C.E.G. CONSTRUCTION

Respondent and Defendant

C.E.G. CONSTRUCTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOURAFCHAN JENUS K. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

2/2/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

SUMMONS

2/2/2018: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/2/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/2/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

3/21/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order

4/4/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/4/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

3/27/2018: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72; (OSC RE Dismissal; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 72; Court Order - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Docketat 2:50 PM in Department 72; Court Order (Court Order; Case Deemed Settled) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff); Chalmers Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C.E.G. CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where E & R CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOURAFCHAN JENUS K. ESQ.