This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2021 at 04:03:46 (UTC).

SOUTHEASTERN INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS CRUMP ENGINEERING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 SOUTHEASTERN INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CRUMP ENGINEERING, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5280

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHEASTERN INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS LLC DBA DIXIE-SOUTHERN

Defendants and Cross Defendants

CRUMP ENGINEERING INC.

FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND

J.F. SHEA CONSTRUCTION INC.

THE METROPOLITAN WATER DISTRICT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

COLONIAL AMERICAN CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY

ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

J.F. SHEA CONSTRUCTION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE CINDY J.

Defendant Attorney

BYER JEFFREY M.

 

Court Documents

Cross-Complaint

9/7/2021: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/7/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/7/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/25/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

8/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/12/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/12/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • Hearing11/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SOUTHEASTERN INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by J.F. SHEA CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant); TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA (Defendant); FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA (Defendant); FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND (Defendant); ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by J.F. SHEA CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by J.F. SHEA CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by SOUTHEASTERN INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by SOUTHEASTERN INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SOUTHEASTERN INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SOUTHEASTERN INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SOUTHEASTERN INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SOUTHEASTERN INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SOUTHEASTERN INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SOUTHEASTERN INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SOUTHEASTERN INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRUMP ENGINEERING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COLONIAL AMERICAN CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where J.F. SHEA CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where METROPOLITAN WATER DISTRICT A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant