This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/16/2022 at 11:57:06 (UTC).

SOUTH BAY CONTRACTORS, INC. VS RUTH BERHANE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 SOUTH BAY CONTRACTORS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RUTH BERHANE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3259

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTH BAY CONTRACTORS INC.

Defendants

BERHANE RUTH

GTS FRANCHISING DBA GATEWAY TAX SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOSS BRYAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/22/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/25/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

6/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/25/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE)

7/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE)

Proof of Personal Service

7/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

11/30/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 11/01/2021

11/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 11/01/2021

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

8/31/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for failure to appear and failure to comply with Court orders) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by South Bay Contractors, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 11/01/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by South Bay Contractors, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • Docketat 2:08 PM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Order to Show Cause)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by South Bay Contractors, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by South Bay Contractors, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Department 69 Online Courtroom Information); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by South Bay Contractors, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by South Bay Contractors, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by South Bay Contractors, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less