This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2022 at 00:03:41 (UTC).

SOUTH BAY CONTRACTORS, A CORPORATION VS KEYVAN SETAREH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 SOUTH BAY CONTRACTORS, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KEYVAN SETAREH,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON and ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8334

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTH BAY CONTRACTORS INC.

Defendants

SETAREH KEYVAN

PACIFIC CAPITAL TRUST

KEYVAN SATERAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOSS BRYAN

Defendant Attorneys

SICILIANO NICHOLAS ARTHUR

MASRYWEEKS LOUANNE

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

4/1/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

4/4/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Request for Dismissal

5/6/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE ADR)

1/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE ADR)

Motion for Leave to Amend - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/16/2022: Motion for Leave to Amend - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER)

3/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER)

Answer - ANSWER AMENDED

3/16/2022: Answer - ANSWER AMENDED

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER

3/18/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE ADR)

11/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE ADR)

Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

11/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

10/8/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Order - ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION

5/11/2021: Order - ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION]

5/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION]

Case Management Statement

4/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

4/12/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/12/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/1/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 52; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by KAYVAN SETAREH, trustee of The Pacific Capital Trust Erroneously Sued As Keyvan Saterah (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application ( to continue trial) - Held - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketEx Parte Application (ex parte application to continue trial); Filed by South Bay Contractors, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulated protective order); Filed by South Bay Contractors, Inc. (Plaintiff); KAYVAN SETAREH, trustee of The Pacific Capital Trust Erroneously Sued As Keyvan Saterah (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend (Answer) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketAnswer (Amended); Filed by KAYVAN SETAREH, trustee of The Pacific Capital Trust Erroneously Sued As Keyvan Saterah (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Answer)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketMotion for Leave to Amend (to File First Amended Answer to Unverified First Amended Complaint); Filed by KAYVAN SETAREH, trustee of The Pacific Capital Trust Erroneously Sued As Keyvan Saterah (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by South Bay Contractors, a Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Keyvan Setareh (Defendant); Keyvan Saterah, Trustee, Pacific Capital Trust, a California Trust (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Unavailability); Filed by Keyvan Setareh (Defendant); Keyvan Saterah, Trustee, Pacific Capital Trust, a California Trust (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by South Bay Contractors, a Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by South Bay Contractors, a Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by South Bay Contractors, a Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******8334 Hearing Date: March 16, 2022 Dept: 52

Tentative Ruling:

Defendant Kayvan Setareh, trustee of The Pacific Capital Trust’s Motion for Leaev to File First Amended Answer

Courts have discretion to permit an amendment to any pleading “in furtherance of justice, and on any terms as may be proper.” (Code Civ. Proc., 473, subd. (a)(1).) Courts exercise their discretion “liberally to permit amendment,” and “[t]he policy favoring amendment is so strong that it is a rare case in which denial of leave to amend can be justified.” (Howard v. County of San Diego (2010) 184 Cal.App.4th 1422, 1428.)

Plaintiff did not oppose either motion. The court finds no basis for denying leave to amend.

The motion is granted. Defendant Kayvan Setareh is ordered to file the first amended answer forthwith.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTH BAY CONTRACTORS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOSS BRYAN