This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/08/2020 at 22:44:34 (UTC).

SORRELL TROPE ET AL VS JALEH ELGHANIAN

Case Summary

On 06/26/2017 SORRELL TROPE filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against JALEH ELGHANIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are FREDERICK C. SHALLER and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0018

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

FREDERICK C. SHALLER

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

TROPE SORRELL

TROPE & TROPE

TROPE & TROPE LLP

TROPE SORRELL DBA TROPE & TROPE

Defendant and Respondent

ELGHANIAN JALEH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

FRIEDMAN & FRIEDMAN LAWYERS

FRIEDMAN DAVID HOWARD

Respondent Attorney

PARTIYELI JACOB OREN

 

Court Documents

Request for Judicial Notice

7/10/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER AFTER HEARING RE: 1. ASSIGNMENT ORDEER 2. TURNOVER ORDER 3. CHARGING ORDER

7/17/2019: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER AFTER HEARING RE: 1. ASSIGNMENT ORDEER 2. TURNOVER ORDER 3. CHARGING ORDER

Order - ORDER (PROPOSED) ORDER RE: MOTION OT COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (C.C.P. 708.030), ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (C.C.P. 708.020, AND FOR ATTORNEYS FEES/SANCTIONS AGAINST RESPONDENT AND HER AT

7/24/2019: Order - ORDER (PROPOSED) ORDER RE: MOTION OT COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (C.C.P. 708.030), ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (C.C.P. 708.020, AND FOR ATTORNEYS FEES/SANCTIONS AGAINST RESPONDENT AND HER AT

Proof of Personal Service

8/1/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/1/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/9/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY?CIVIL (WITHOUT COURT ORDER)

8/28/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY?CIVIL (WITHOUT COURT ORDER)

Request for Judicial Notice

1/24/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion for Order - Motion for Order For: 1) Assignment Order 2) Turnover Order 3) Charging Order; Memorandum of Points And Authorities

1/24/2019: Motion for Order - Motion for Order For: 1) Assignment Order 2) Turnover Order 3) Charging Order; Memorandum of Points And Authorities

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/22/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Personal Service

3/1/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/21/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

EX PARTE APPLICATION WITH NOTICE FOR APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR FOR BINDING ARBITRATION; DECLARATION OF IRA M. FRIEDMAN; DECLARATION OF PATRICIA MURPHY RE: EX PARTE NOTICE

1/9/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION WITH NOTICE FOR APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR FOR BINDING ARBITRATION; DECLARATION OF IRA M. FRIEDMAN; DECLARATION OF PATRICIA MURPHY RE: EX PARTE NOTICE

Minute Order -

1/9/2018: Minute Order -

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF: EX PARTE ORDER AFTER HEARING TO APPOINT AN ARBITRATOR

1/10/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF: EX PARTE ORDER AFTER HEARING TO APPOINT AN ARBITRATOR

Unknown

10/25/2017: Unknown

VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR APPOINTMEN

6/26/2017: VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR APPOINTMEN

NOTICE OF HEARING ON VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR

6/29/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING ON VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketOrder (AFTER HEARING ON PETITIONER'S MOTION AND MOTION FOR FORECLOSURE ON PARTNERSHIP INTERESTS PURSUANT TO CORPORATIONS CODE SECTION 17302 AND C.C.P. SEC.708.310); Filed by Sorrell Trope (Petitioner); Trope & Trope (Legacy Party); Trope & Trope LLP (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Foreclosure on Partnership Interests Pursuant to Corporations Code Section 17302 and CCP 708.310, Declarations of Ira M. Friedman and David Friedman, Memorandum of Points and Authorities) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Foreclosure on Partnership Interest...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketMotion re: (FOR FORECLOSURE ON PARTNERSHIP INTERESTS PURSUANT TO CORPORATIONS CODE SECTION 17302 AND C.C.P. 708.310); Filed by Sorrell Trope (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Sorrell Trope (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Sorrell Trope (Petitioner); Trope & Trope LLP (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Sorrell Trope (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Trope & Trope LLP (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Sorrell Trope (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Sorrell Trope (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING ON PETITIONER'S PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Sorrell Trope (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 46; (Hearing on Petition; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-10-20 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Sorrell Trope (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Service Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketVERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketPetition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TROPE & TROPE LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARTIYELI JACOB O