This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 04:46:24 (UTC).

SORRELL TROPE ET AL VS HOSSEIN YAGHMAI

Case Summary

On 09/20/2017 SORRELL TROPE filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against HOSSEIN YAGHMAI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL JOHNSON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0919

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

TROPE SORRELL

TROPE & TROPE

TROPE & TROPE LLP

Defendant and Respondent

YAGHMAI HOSSEIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

FRIEDMAN IRA M. ESQ.

FRIEDMAN DAVID HOWARD ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

2/15/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE

2/26/2018: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE

Minute Order

6/29/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY

7/2/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY

Minute Order

9/6/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY

9/7/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY

Notice

11/16/2018: Notice

Request for Dismissal

2/19/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

2/20/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

2/20/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

1/8/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUTPCY BY RESPONDENT AND AUTOMATIC STAY

1/9/2018: NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUTPCY BY RESPONDENT AND AUTOMATIC STAY

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY

1/9/2018: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY

Proof of Service

11/16/2017: Proof of Service

VERIFIED PETIITIONTO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR APPOINTMEN

9/20/2017: VERIFIED PETIITIONTO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR APPOINTMEN

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

9/26/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/26/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF HEARING ON VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR

9/27/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING ON VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to Appear of Counsel) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Status Conference) of 02/20/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by SORRELL TROPE (Plaintiff); TROPE & TROPE LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Notice of continuance of status conference re: bankruptcy; Filed by HOSSEIN YAGHMAI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Minute Order ((Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by SORRELL TROPE (Plaintiff); TROPE & TROPE (Legacy Party); TROPE & TROPE LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by SORRELL TROPE (Plaintiff); TROPE & TROPE (Legacy Party); TROPE & TROPE LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Notice of Hearing; Filed by SORRELL TROPE (Plaintiff); TROPE & TROPE (Legacy Party); TROPE & TROPE LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • VERIFIED PETIITIONTO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TROPE & TROPE LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRIEDMAN IRA M.