This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/06/2017 at 23:32:33 (UTC).

SORRELL TROPE ET AL VS GIHAN GHARGHOURY

Case Summary

On 06/26/2017 SORRELL TROPE filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against GIHAN GHARGHOURY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0015

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

TROPE & TROPE

TROPE & TROPE LLP

SORRELL TROPE

Defendant and Respondent

GHARGHOURY GIHAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FRIEDMAN & FRIEDMAN LAWYERS

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR APPOINTMEN

6/26/2017: VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR APPOINTMEN

NOTICE OF HEARING ON VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR

6/28/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING ON VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/16/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2017
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (Without prejudice Entire action ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Notice of Hearing (ON VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TROPE & TROPE LLP is a litigant