This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 04:37:32 (UTC).

SORAYA, LLC VS LUZ MARIA PALOMO

Case Summary

On 10/25/2017 SORAYA, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against LUZ MARIA PALOMO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6667

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SORAYA LLC

Defendants

PALOMO FIDEL

PALOMO LUZ MARIA

MARISA'S MEXICAN RESTAURANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDELBAUM & ROBINSON

 

Court Documents

Unknown

7/23/2018: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2018
  • Writ filed; Filed by SORAYA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Writ - Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Writ filed (RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F; (Order to Show Cause; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (REGARDING STATUS ON MONEYJUDGMENT;C/F 04/11/18) - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by SORAYA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Satisfaction of Judgment (FULL SATISFACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • at 01:30 pm in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Matter held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2017
  • Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS MAILING AND POSTING ON 11-01-17 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SUBSTITUTED SERVICE TO JOHN DOE ON 11-01-17 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by SORAYA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Summons; Filed by SORAYA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by SORAYA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SORAYA LLC is a litigant