This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2022 at 02:19:29 (UTC).

SOPHIE KIA VS EMMANUEL SANTIAGO

Case Summary

On 06/08/2022 SOPHIE KIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EMMANUEL SANTIAGO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8749

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIA SOPHIE

Defendant

SANTIAGO EMMANUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAYAGHI HOUMAN

Defendant Attorney

BIRCH YVONNE

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/8/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/8/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

6/8/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

6/8/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/8/2022: Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/9/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

6/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

7/13/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Answer

7/11/2022: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

7/20/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/22/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Mail

7/20/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Dismissal

11/14/2022: Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Sophie Kia on 06/08/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Sophie Kia as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Sophie Kia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Emmanuel Santiago (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Sophie Kia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Sophie Kia (Plaintiff); As to: Emmanuel Santiago (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Emmanuel Santiago (Defendant); As to: Yvonne Birch (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Emmanuel Santiago (Defendant); As to: Sophie Kia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sophie Kia (Plaintiff); As to: Emmanuel Santiago (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sophie Kia (Plaintiff); As to: Emmanuel Santiago (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BIRCH YVONNE