This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/07/2021 at 03:16:09 (UTC).

SOPHIE HONG, ET AL. VS RAYMOND ROBERTO TOVAR, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 SOPHIE HONG filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RAYMOND ROBERTO TOVAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3490

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HONG SOPHIE

NG ULYSSES KOSAL Y.

Defendants

FAIR MOBILITY SERVICES LLC

FAIR TITLING TRUST

TOVAR RAYMOND ROBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOMEZ DARIO C.

Defendant Attorney

RASHTIAN SIAVASH

 

Court Documents

Answer

7/30/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

7/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/8/2021: PI General Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

6/23/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2024
  • Hearing06/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • Hearing12/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • Hearing12/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Fair Mobility Services, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sophie Hong (Plaintiff); Ulysses Kosal Y. Ng (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sophie Hong (Plaintiff); Ulysses Kosal Y. Ng (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sophie Hong (Plaintiff); Ulysses Kosal Y. Ng (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sophie Hong (Plaintiff); Ulysses Kosal Y. Ng (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sophie Hong (Plaintiff); Ulysses Kosal Y. Ng (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAIR MOBILITY SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FAIR TITLING TRUST LSR is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOMEZ DARIO C.