This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 21:21:11 (UTC).

SOPHIE COOK VS AFTER DARK FILMS, LLC., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 SOPHIE COOK filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against AFTER DARK FILMS, LLC , A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTHONY MOHR. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1358

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANTHONY MOHR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COOK SOPHIE

Defendants

CINELOU DEVELOPMENT FILMS LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SOLOMON COURTNEY

CINELOU FILMS LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CINELOU HOLDING LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

AFTER DARK FILMS LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DESJARDINS MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/19/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/18/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/1/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

9/10/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SOPHIE COOK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SOPHIE COOK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SOPHIE COOK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SOPHIE COOK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINELOU FILMS LLC is a litigant