This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/17/2023 at 17:09:36 (UTC).

SOPHIA SOLI VS POLARIS INDUSTRIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/15/2022 SOPHIA SOLI filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against POLARIS INDUSTRIES, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WESLEY L. HSU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1829

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WESLEY L. HSU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOLI SOPHIA

Defendants

POLARIS INDUSTRIES INC.

SEIDNER ENTERPRISES LLC DBA BERT'S MEGA MALL

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

SEIDNER ENTERPRISES LLC DBA BERT'S MEGA MALL

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 TO 25 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLOYD JEREMY

Defendant Attorneys

MANISCO BRETT MICHAEL

HUENNEKENS LAUREN ELYSE

KIM HYONGSOON

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

GUTIERREZ EDGAR J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

5/11/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/28/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 04/20/2023

4/20/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 04/20/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/20/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/14/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

4/13/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/6/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/5/2023: Case Management Statement

Answer

3/7/2023: Answer

Cross-Complaint

3/7/2023: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/7/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/7/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Appearance

3/3/2023: Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

3/3/2023: Notice of Appearance

Answer

3/3/2023: Answer

Notice of Appearance

3/3/2023: Notice of Appearance

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/21/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Personal Service

2/2/2023: Proof of Personal Service

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2023
  • Hearing08/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department K at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pomona Courthouse South in Department K - Hon. Peter A. Hernandezeffective 05/22/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- 08/21/2023 Case Management Conference: Location changed from Department L to Department K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: SOPHIA SOLI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of 04/20/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08/21/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: POLARIS INDUSTRIES, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Peter A. Hernandez in Department O Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SOPHIA SOLI (Plaintiff); As to: POLARIS INDUSTRIES, INC. (Defendant); SEIDNER ENTERPRISES, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SOPHIA SOLI (Plaintiff); As to: POLARIS INDUSTRIES, INC. (Defendant); SEIDNER ENTERPRISES, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SOPHIA SOLI (Plaintiff); As to: POLARIS INDUSTRIES, INC. (Defendant); SEIDNER ENTERPRISES, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less