This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2021 at 01:19:22 (UTC).

SOPHIA JIMENEZ VS TOP PRODUCERS A & L INC

Case Summary

On 12/11/2020 SOPHIA JIMENEZ filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against TOP PRODUCERS A L INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7584

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JIMENEZ SOPHIA

Defendant

TOP PRODUCERS A & L INC DBA RE/MAX TOP PRODUCERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERZLICH ALLAN EDWARD

Defendant Attorneys

MALEK JONATHAN A

ANAYA ALANA B

 

Court Documents

Informal Discovery Conference

9/24/2021: Informal Discovery Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

8/5/2021: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALANA B. ANAYA RE DEMURRER

7/20/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALANA B. ANAYA RE DEMURRER

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

7/22/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

7/22/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Amended Complaint - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/30/2021: Amended Complaint - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION THE MOTION TO STRIKE OF TOP PRODUCERS A & L TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/15/2021: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION THE MOTION TO STRIKE OF TOP PRODUCERS A & L TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF TOP PRODUCERS A & L TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/15/2021: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF TOP PRODUCERS A & L TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) - AS...)

6/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) - AS...)

Order - RULING RE DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT WITH MOTION TO STRIKE

6/23/2021: Order - RULING RE DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT WITH MOTION TO STRIKE

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRSTAMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT

5/27/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRSTAMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST-AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF ALLAN HERZLICH IN SUPPORT

5/27/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST-AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF ALLAN HERZLICH IN SUPPORT

Case Management Statement

6/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/7/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

2/17/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALANA B. ANAYA RE DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/16/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALANA B. ANAYA RE DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • Hearing11/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Hearing11/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • Hearing10/21/2021 at 3:30 PM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference; Filed by Sophia Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Sophia Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Sophia Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by TOP PRODUCERS A & L INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by TOP PRODUCERS A & L INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Sophia Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Sophia Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF ALANA B. ANAYA RE DEMURRER); Filed by TOP PRODUCERS A & L INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by TOP PRODUCERS A & L INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extention); Filed by TOP PRODUCERS A & L INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sophia Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sophia Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sophia Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOP PRODUCERS A & L INC DBA RE/MAX TOP PRODUCERS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERZLICH ALLAN