This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2021 at 02:00:37 (UTC).

SOPHIA HERNANDEZ, ET AL. VS EDMUNDO MELCHOR

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 SOPHIA HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EDMUNDO MELCHOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0203

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARIAS SONIA ELIZABETH

Defendant

MELCHOR EDMUNDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FOWLER JASON PAUL

DOUGLASS JONATHAN WARREN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/19/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

3/19/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

6/23/2021: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

7/13/2021: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

7/13/2021: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

7/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

8/27/2021: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT (SET OSC RE DISMISSAL))

8/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT (SET OSC RE DISMISSAL))

Request for Dismissal

8/30/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Deposit (Set OSC re Dismissal)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Deposit (Set OSC re Dismissal))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Sophia Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Sophia Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Sophia Hernandez (Plaintiff); Sonia Elizabeth Farias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Sophia Hernandez (Plaintiff); Sonia Elizabeth Farias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketPetition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim; Filed by Sophia Hernandez (Plaintiff); Sonia Elizabeth Farias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Sophia Hernandez (Plaintiff); Sonia Elizabeth Farias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sophia Hernandez (Plaintiff); Sonia Elizabeth Farias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sophia Hernandez (Plaintiff); Sonia Elizabeth Farias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOUGLASS JONATHAN WARREN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FOWLER JASON PAUL