This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2018 at 05:46:07 (UTC).

SOPHIA BILLAN VS JOSE MEDRANO MD ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 SOPHIA BILLAN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against JOSE MEDRANO MD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8295

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BILLAN SOPHIA

Respondents and Defendants

MEDRANO JOSE MD

MAXWELL JAMES MD

CLELAND LAURIE M.D.

THE BURBANK BREAST CARE CENTER

DOES 1 TO 100

ENCINO BREAST CARE CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ORAN MICHAEL L. ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

PACKER ROBERT B. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

3/9/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/10/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/10/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

4/10/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Unknown

4/10/2018: Unknown

DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

4/10/2018: DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/15/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

6/27/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS

7/12/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) MEDICAL MALPRACTICE.

7/12/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) MEDICAL MALPRACTICE.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Notice (POSTING JURY FEES *PARTY NOT LISTED F/B PACKER O'LEARY & CORSON ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Declaration ( *PARTY NOT LISTED F/B PACKER O'LEARY & CORSON ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Answer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Demand for Jury Trial ( *PARTY NOT LISTED F/B PACKER O'LEARY CORSON, ATT DEF ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT RE JURY FEES $150.00 TRIAL DATE: 1/11/19 ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Receipt (JURY FEES POSTED *STEANIE TODD NOT LISTED AS PLTF IN PARTIES *PARTY NOT LISTED LEE & ASSOCIATES, ATT FOR PLTF T); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENCINO BREAST CARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ORAN MICHAEL LAWRENCE