This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/24/2019 at 01:22:02 (UTC).

SOOFIA GHOOKASIAN VS GASKA INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/27/2018 SOOFIA GHOOKASIAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GASKA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5706

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GHOOKASIAN SOOFIA

Respondents and Defendants

GGF II LLC

AMTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES

PACIFIC COAST ELEVATOR CORPORATION

GASKA INC

DOES 1 TO 50

ABM INDUSTRIES INCORPORATED (DOE 1)

AMTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES (DOE 1)

AMTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES DOE 1

ABM INDUSTRIES INCORPORATED DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SHEKARCHIAN HALEH ESQ.

BRITO EDUARDO ARTURO

SHEKARCHIAN HALEH

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

DENTONS US LLP

LAW OFFICES OF KIRK & MYERS

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/19/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

5/31/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

5/31/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Notice of Settlement

5/20/2019: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order

5/7/2019: Minute Order

Motion re:

3/11/2019: Motion re:

Motion re:

3/11/2019: Motion re:

Notice of Motion

3/29/2019: Notice of Motion

Separate Statement

3/29/2019: Separate Statement

Declaration

3/29/2019: Declaration

Declaration

3/29/2019: Declaration

Declaration

3/29/2019: Declaration

Declaration

3/29/2019: Declaration

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

7/26/2018: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

CROSS-COMPLAINR OF AMTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES FOR: 1. EXPRESS INDEMNITY; 2. IMPLIED INDEMNITY; 3. EQUITABLE APPORTIONMENT; AND 4. DECLARATORY RELIEF.

6/21/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINR OF AMTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES FOR: 1. EXPRESS INDEMNITY; 2. IMPLIED INDEMNITY; 3. EQUITABLE APPORTIONMENT; AND 4. DECLARATORY RELIEF.

CROSS-DEFENDANT PACIFIC COAST ELEVATOR CORPORATION DBA AMTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES' ANSWER TO CROSSCO PLAINTIFF OF GASKA, INC. AND GGC 11 LLC

6/21/2018: CROSS-DEFENDANT PACIFIC COAST ELEVATOR CORPORATION DBA AMTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES' ANSWER TO CROSSCO PLAINTIFF OF GASKA, INC. AND GGC 11 LLC

Proof of Service

6/6/2018: Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/8/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Soofia Ghookasian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • at 2:00 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order Pursuant to Notice of Settlement;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Pursuant to Notice of Settlement;) of 05/31/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Soofia Ghookasian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Non Party Compliance) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Order (to Show Cause Why Dr. Herach Yadegarian and his Custodian of Record Should not be Held in Contempt of Court for the Failure to Comply with Defendant's Subpoena Duces Tecum; Request for Sanctions) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Dr. Herach Yade...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Gaska Inc (Defendant); GGF II LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Soofia Ghookasian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Soofia Ghookasian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Soofia Ghookasian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Soofia Ghookasian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GASKA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC COAST ELEVATOR CORPORATION DBA AMTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES (INCORRECTLY NAMED AND SUED HEREIN AS AMTECH ELEVATOR SERVICE INC.) is a litigant

Latest cases where AMTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where ABM INDUSTRIES INCORPORATED is a litigant