Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/30/2021 at 03:42:36 (UTC).

SONYA YOSHINAGA VS AMERICAN MULTI-CINEMA, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 SONYA YOSHINAGA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AMERICAN MULTI-CINEMA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8273

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YOSHINAGA SONYA

Defendant

AMERICAN MULTI-CINEMA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZEESMAN ALEXANDER JOSHUA

ZEESMAN DIANA

ZEESMAN DIANA ESQ.

ZEESMAN ALEXANDER JOSHUA ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

CLINTON DAVID A.

CLINTON DAVID ALLEN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S DEMURRER TO DEFENDANT'S ANSWER

7/13/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S DEMURRER TO DEFENDANT'S ANSWER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE JUNE 9, 2021 HEARING TO S...) OF 06/01/2021

6/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE JUNE 9, 2021 HEARING TO S...) OF 06/01/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE JUNE 9, 2021 HEARING TO S...)

6/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE JUNE 9, 2021 HEARING TO S...)

Reply - REPLY REPLY BRIEF: PLAINTIFFS DEMURRER TO THE ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN MULTI-CINEMA, INC.

6/2/2021: Reply - REPLY REPLY BRIEF: PLAINTIFFS DEMURRER TO THE ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN MULTI-CINEMA, INC.

Answer

4/26/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

4/26/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

5/17/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT, AMERICAN MULTI-CINEMA, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF, SONYA YOSHINAGA'S DEMURRER TO ANSWER

5/25/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT, AMERICAN MULTI-CINEMA, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF, SONYA YOSHINAGA'S DEMURRER TO ANSWER

Proof of Personal Service

4/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

3/18/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/3/2021: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2024
  • Hearing02/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • Hearing08/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • Hearing08/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • Hearing09/02/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Entry of Order Re Continuance of Hearing on Plaintiff's Demurrer to Defendant's Answer); Filed by Sonya Yoshinaga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (- Plaintiff's Demurrer to the Answer filed by Defendant American Multi-Cinema, Inc. on 04/26/2021 (CCP 430.20)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketReply (REPLY BRIEF: PLAINTIFF?S DEMURRER TO THE ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN MULTI-CINEMA, INC.); Filed by Sonya Yoshinaga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docketat 4:18 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of the June 9, 2021 Hearing to S...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Continuance of the June 9, 2021 Hearing to S...) of 06/01/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDemurrer to the Answer Filed by Defendant American Multi-Cinema, Inc. on 04/26/2021 (CCP 430.20); Filed by Sonya Yoshinaga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by American Multi-Cinema, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by American Multi-Cinema, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sonya Yoshinaga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sonya Yoshinaga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sonya Yoshinaga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sonya Yoshinaga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 21STCV08273    Hearing Date: June 9, 2021    Dept: 29

SONYA YOSHINAGA vs AMERICAN MULTI-CINEMA, INC.

Court Order Re: Continuance of the June 9, 2021 Hearing to September 2, 2021;

On the Court's own motion, the Hearing on Plaintiff's Demurrer to the Answer filed by Defendant American Multi-Cinema, Inc. on 04/26/2021 (CCP 430.20) scheduled for 06/09/2021 is continued to 09/02/2021 at 01:30 PM in Department 29 at Spring Street Courthouse.

Counsel for the Moving Party is ordered to give notice and to file proof of service of said notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICA MULTI-CINEMA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEESMAN DIANA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEESMAN ALEXANDER JOSHUA