This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/19/2023 at 13:38:56 (UTC).

SONYA LIM PARRAS, AN INDIVIDUAL VS WEST HILLS HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/15/2021 SONYA LIM PARRAS, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WEST HILLS HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LIA MARTIN and MICHAEL P. LINFIELD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5669

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LIA MARTIN

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARRAS SONYA LIM

Defendants

C-HCA INC.

HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF TENNESSEE INC.

WEST HILLS HOSPITAL

WEST HILLS HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOMEZ JESSICA P.

Defendant Attorney

NGO MINH PHUNG

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE ...)

7/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC) REQUESTED BY PLAINTIFF,)

7/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC) REQUESTED BY PLAINTIFF,)

Notice of Continuance

7/19/2022: Notice of Continuance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR INFORM...)

7/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR INFORM...)

Informal Discovery Conference

7/5/2022: Informal Discovery Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR INFORM...) OF 07/05/2022

7/5/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR INFORM...) OF 07/05/2022

Informal Discovery Conference - RESPONSE TO IDC

6/28/2022: Informal Discovery Conference - RESPONSE TO IDC

Notice of Ruling

5/27/2022: Notice of Ruling

Order - COURT'S CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

5/9/2022: Order - COURT'S CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

4/22/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/22/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

4/27/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

3/28/2022: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/1/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

3/18/2022: Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

3/18/2022: Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/22/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2024
  • Hearing01/29/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2024
  • Hearing01/19/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 10/26/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16 Type changed from Hearing on Joinder to Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication to Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) Requested by Plaintiff,)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference (IDC) Requested by Plaintiff, scheduled for 07/22/2022 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16 updated: Result Date to 07/22/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference (IDC) Requested by Plaintiff, scheduled for 07/22/2022 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Continuance of INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE ...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) Requested by Plaintiff, scheduled for 07/20/2022 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 07/22/2022 10:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by: Sonya Lim Parras (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference (IDC) Requested by Plaintiff, scheduled for 07/20/2022 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- HCA Health Services of Tennessee, Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF TENNESSEE, INC., A MEDICAL CENTER A TENNESSEE CORPORATION to HCA Health Services of Tennessee, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Liliuokalani H. Martin (Attorney): First Name changed from DANIEL to Liliuokalani; Last Name changed from AZIZI to Martin; Organization Name changed from DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP to Downtown L.A. Law Group; Middle Name: H.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketAddress for Liliuokalani H. Martin (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael P. Linfield in Department 34 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SONYA LIM PARRAS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: WEST HILLS HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM (Defendant); WEST HILLS HOSPITAL, A MEDICAL CENTER A TENNESSEE CORPORATION (Defendant); C-HCA, INC., AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SONYA LIM PARRAS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: WEST HILLS HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM (Defendant); WEST HILLS HOSPITAL, A MEDICAL CENTER A TENNESSEE CORPORATION (Defendant); C-HCA, INC., AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SONYA LIM PARRAS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: WEST HILLS HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM (Defendant); WEST HILLS HOSPITAL, A MEDICAL CENTER A TENNESSEE CORPORATION (Defendant); C-HCA, INC., AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less