This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2022 at 05:06:34 (UTC).

SONYA FLORES VS GT RIDE LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 SONYA FLORES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GT RIDE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3577

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORES SONYA

Defendants

TONOYAN ARMEN

GT RIDE LLC

TONOYAN GEVORG

AVETISIAN GEVORG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUINONES GILBERT

Defendant Attorney

HONG LYNDON HYON

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/14/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

8/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE ANSWER

6/23/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE ANSWER

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/12/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

7/12/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER SETTING TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 07/13/2021

7/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER SETTING TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 07/13/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER SETTING TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

7/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER SETTING TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GILBERT QUINONES

5/3/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GILBERT QUINONES

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/3/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF

5/3/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...) OF 05/05/2021

5/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...) OF 05/05/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

5/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/8/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF PURSUANT TO CCP 585D

3/30/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF PURSUANT TO CCP 585D

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GILBERT QUINONES

3/30/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GILBERT QUINONES

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

3/29/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/30/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/30/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Sonya Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docketat 1:49 PM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Setting Trial Setting Conference) of 07/13/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Setting Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by GT Ride LLC (Defendant); Armen Tonoyan (Defendant); Gevorg Avetisian (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by GT Ride LLC (Defendant); Armen Tonoyan (Defendant); Gevorg Avetisian (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Set Aside Default and for Leave to File Answer); Filed by GT Ride LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Enter Default Judgment as to Defendants Armen Tonoyan and GT Ride LLC) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Gilbert Quinones); Filed by Sonya Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Sonya Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sonya Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order for PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sonya Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sonya Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sonya Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sonya Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******3577    Hearing Date: May 5, 2021    Dept: 28

Plaintiff seeks default judgment in the amount of $56,620 ($50,000 in general damages [pain, suffering, and inconvenience], $6,100 in special damages [medical expenses to date], and $520 in costs [filing fee and service fee].) 

Plaintiff’s default judgment applications are deficient: (1) Plaintiff has provided insufficient evidence of her pain and suffering. Plaintiff must provide the Court with more detail to justify an award of $50,000 in general damages; and (2) Plaintiff has not dismissed Defendants Gevorg Avetisian and Gevorg Tonoyan. 

The hearing on the order to show cause is continued to June 7, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. in D. 28 so that Plaintiff can provide additional evidence of her general damages and dismiss Defendants Gevorg Avetisian and Gevorg Tonoyan. 


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GT RIDE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HONG LYNDON H. ESQ.