This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/13/2021 at 19:22:13 (UTC).

SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT VS ROK MOBILE INC.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT filed an Other - Sister State Judgment lawsuit against ROK MOBILE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0145

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Sister State Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT

Defendant

ROK MOBILE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEISSKOPF STEPHEN D.

 

Court Documents

Declaration - PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF POST JUDGMENT INTEREST CALCULATIONS [PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE OF PROCEDURE 685.050]

4/1/2021: Declaration - PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF POST JUDGMENT INTEREST CALCULATIONS [PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE OF PROCEDURE 685.050]

Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment

4/1/2021: Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER STATE JUDGMENT

4/1/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER STATE JUDGMENT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Judgment

4/1/2021: Judgment

Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)

4/22/2021: Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Sister State Judgment); Filed by SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Affidavit of Post Judgment Interest Calculations [Pursuant to Civil Code of Procedure 685.050]; Filed by SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment on Sister State Judgment); Filed by SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketApplication for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment; Filed by SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sony Music Entertainment Italy S.p.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where ROK MOBILE INC. is a litigant