This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 00:09:20 (UTC).

SONNIA ABA AHINASI VS KLLM TRANSPORT SERVICES LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/08/2017 SONNIA ABA AHINASI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KLLM TRANSPORT SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5227

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AHINASI SONNIA ABA

Defendants

STRATTON JOHN HUGH JR.

FEE TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC

KLLM TRANSPORT TRANSPORT SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

YAGOUBZADEH LAW FIRM LLP

KHEHRA GURSHARN SINGH

Defendant Attorney

BOOTH HILLARY ARROW ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

9/8/2017: SUMMONS

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

9/8/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

9/8/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

Unknown

9/8/2017: Unknown

Other -

9/11/2017: Other -

Minute Order

9/28/2017: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

10/12/2017: Notice of Ruling

ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF SONNIA ABA AHINASI'S COMPLAENT

1/9/2018: ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF SONNIA ABA AHINASI'S COMPLAENT

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

12/28/2017: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

12/28/2017: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/3/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/4/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

12/21/2018: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by YAGOUBZADEH LAW FIRM, LLP (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by KLLM TRANSPORT TRANSPORT SERVICES LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by SONNIA ABA AHINASI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by KLLM TRANSPORT TRANSPORT SERVICES LLC (Defendant); FEE TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, INC (Defendant); JOHN HUGH JR. STRATTON (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO PLAINTIFF SONNIA ABA AHINASI'S COMPLAENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by SONNIA ABA AHINASI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2017
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 98; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-09-28 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by SONNIA ABA AHINASI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SONNIA ABA AHINASI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****5227    Hearing Date: October 31, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

SONNIA ABA AHINASI,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

KILM TRANSPORT SERVICES, LLC, et al.

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: ****5227

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

October 31, 2019

Plaintiff, Sonnia Aba Ahinasi filed this action against Defendants, KLLM Transport Services, LLC, FFE Transportation Services, Inc., and John Hugh Stratton, Jr. for damages arising out of an automobile accident.  Plaintiff filed her complaint on 9/08/17, and the case was originally set for trial on 3/08/19. 

Defendants filed a joint answer to the complaint on 1/09/18.  On 12/21/18, the parties submitted a stipulation to continue the trial date to 9/05/19, and the Court issued an order in accordance with the stipulation.  On 6/03/19, the Court granted Plaintiff’s unopposed ex parte application to continue the trial from 9/05/19 to 3/23/20.

At this time, Plaintiff moves to continue the trial date from 3/23/20 to 9/21/20.  Plaintiff contends the continuance is necessary because (a) despite diligence, the parties have not completed discovery, (b) the parties wish to participate in mediation, which is scheduled for February of 2020, and (c) Plaintiff’s attorney is scheduled to participate in another trial in March of 2020.

The Court is hesitant to grant the motion in light of the two prior extended continuances of the trial date, and also in light of the lengthy duration of the requested continuance.  There is plenty of time between now and March of 2020 to conduct discovery.  If the parties’ chosen mediator isn’t available until February of 2020, it seems likely the parties could choose another mediator with availability in the near future.  As for Plaintiff’s attorney being in two trials in March of 2020, this is still five months away, and it is entirely possible one or both trials won’t go forward.  Additionally, Plaintiff did not articulate whether the other case has previously had the trial date continued, or whether a continuance of the trial date in the other case would be possible.

The motion to continue the trial date is denied at this time.  The Court asks the parties to work diligently to complete discovery and participate in mediation.  This ruling is without prejudice to the parties’ right to renew the request for relief as the trial date grows nearer.  The Court does, however, advise the parties that it will require a showing of good cause to continue the trial date again in this case.  The case has been pending for over two years, and has been at issue for almost two years.  This is not a complicated case, and the Court expects Counsel and the parties to diligently work to resolve the action without the need for a trial continuance. 

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.  


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FEE TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOOTH HILLARY ARROW