Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/24/2021 at 07:11:47 (UTC).

SONJA FARRUGIA VS HERSEL MOLAYEM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 SONJA FARRUGIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HERSEL MOLAYEM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6633

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARRUGIA SONJA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

AMOUNA FARIBA

MOLAYEM FAMILY TRUST

MOLAYEM HERSEL

ZUMA HOUSING SANTA MONICA LLC

MOLAYEM FAYE

Cross Defendant

MOES 1-100 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VERTUN ALAN S.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HURLEY BETH

LAWLESS KEVIN E.

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/5/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BETH HURLEY

2/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BETH HURLEY

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

2/9/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ...)

2/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ...)

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING

2/10/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/22/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Change of Firm Name

4/28/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/11/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/11/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/14/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Answer

11/20/2019: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/20/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

10/29/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/29/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/29/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/15/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/15/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/15/2019: Complaint

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • Hearing10/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Hearing10/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Hearing09/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SONJA FARRUGIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by HERSEL MOLAYEM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Ruling); Filed by HERSEL MOLAYEM (Defendant); FAYE MOLAYEM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for an Order Shortening Time or in the Alternative an Order to Continue Trial Date) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for an Order Shortening Time or in the Alternative an Order to Continue Trial Date); Filed by HERSEL MOLAYEM (Defendant); FAYE MOLAYEM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SONJA FARRUGIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SONJA FARRUGIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SONJA FARRUGIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SONJA FARRUGIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SONJA FARRUGIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SONJA FARRUGIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SONJA FARRUGIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SONJA FARRUGIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZUMA HOUSING SANTA MONICA LLC A CA LTD. LIAB. CO. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VERTUN ALAN S.