Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2021 at 21:30:45 (UTC).

SONIA VILLARREAL VS MONTEBELLO CAR WASH, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/02/2020 SONIA VILLARREAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MONTEBELLO CAR WASH, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6121

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLARREAL SONIA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

WHITTIER CAR WASH INC.

MONTEBELLO CAR WASH INC.

CAR AROMA SUPPLIES INC.

Defendant and Cross Defendant

CAR AROMA SUPPLIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VAZIRI SIAMAK

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

HONEY ANNE M

LERMAN JEFFREY E.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LERMAN JEFFREY E.

 

Court Documents

Answer

4/9/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

3/17/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

3/17/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

3/17/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/3/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/11/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/22/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

1/22/2021: Answer

PI General Order

1/8/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

1/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/2/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/2/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Demand for Jury Trial

12/2/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/2/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/2/2020: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2023
  • Hearing11/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • Hearing06/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Hearing05/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CAR AROMA SUPPLIES, INC. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by WHITTIER CAR WASH, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by WHITTIER CAR WASH, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by WHITTIER CAR WASH, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by WHITTIER CAR WASH, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SONIA VILLARREAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by CAR AROMA SUPPLIES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CAR AROMA SUPPLIES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SONIA VILLARREAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by SONIA VILLARREAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SONIA VILLARREAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SONIA VILLARREAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SONIA VILLARREAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONTEBELLO CAR WASH INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CAR AROMA SUPPLIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HONEY ANNE M