This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2023 at 04:55:49 (UTC).

SONIA MARISSA MONTELONGO VS DEBORAH LYNN RIVEROS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 SONIA MARISSA MONTELONGO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DEBORAH LYNN RIVEROS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0275

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONTELONGO SONIA MARISSA

Defendants

RIVEROS DEBORAH LYNN

RIVEROS ROBERT W.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEECHER BRIAN G.

Defendant Attorney

MADER CINDY NGUYEN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/30/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/30/2023: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/30/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/30/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/31/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/31/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/21/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/24/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/24/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/29/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

3/29/2023: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

3/29/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/10/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

5/10/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

5/11/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2023
  • Hearing06/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department K at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pomona Courthouse South in Department K - Hon. Peter A. Hernandezeffective 05/22/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- 06/14/2023 Case Management Conference: Location changed from Department L to Department K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: SONIA MARISSA MONTELONGO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: SONIA MARISSA MONTELONGO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: DEBORAH LYNN RIVEROS (Defendant); ROBERT W. RIVEROS (Defendant); As to: SONIA MARISSA MONTELONGO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: DEBORAH LYNN RIVEROS (Defendant); ROBERT W. RIVEROS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: DEBORAH LYNN RIVEROS (Defendant); ROBERT W. RIVEROS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Peter A. Hernandez in Department L Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SONIA MARISSA MONTELONGO (Plaintiff); As to: DEBORAH LYNN RIVEROS (Defendant); ROBERT W. RIVEROS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SONIA MARISSA MONTELONGO (Plaintiff); As to: DEBORAH LYNN RIVEROS (Defendant); ROBERT W. RIVEROS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SONIA MARISSA MONTELONGO (Plaintiff); As to: DEBORAH LYNN RIVEROS (Defendant); ROBERT W. RIVEROS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less