This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/02/2023 at 05:40:16 (UTC).

SONIA M. AGUIRRE VS JOHN THOMAS BEAL

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 SONIA M AGUIRRE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOHN THOMAS BEAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0263

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGUIRRE SONIA M.

Defendant

BEAL JOHN THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZIMMERMAN WILLIAM

Defendant Attorney

CULLINS DOUGLAS DRAKE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/4/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/4/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/4/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/4/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

1/13/2022: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

1/13/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE (JOHN THOMAS BEAL)

4/6/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE (JOHN THOMAS BEAL)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/5/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/5/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2024
  • Hearing12/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • Hearing07/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • Hearing06/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: John Thomas Beal (Defendant); As to: Sonia M. Aguirre (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: John Thomas Beal (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (John Thomas Beal); Filed by: Sonia M. Aguirre (Plaintiff); As to: John Thomas Beal (Defendant); Service Date: 03/26/2022; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 12/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sonia M. Aguirre (Plaintiff); As to: John Thomas Beal (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sonia M. Aguirre (Plaintiff); As to: John Thomas Beal (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sonia M. Aguirre (Plaintiff); As to: John Thomas Beal (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CULLINS DOUGLAS DRAKE