This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 07:14:58 (UTC).

SONG GAO ET AL VS SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/11/2018 a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice case was filed by SONG GAO against SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0061

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Guardian Ad Litems

LIU YING

GAO SONG

Respondents and Defendants

METHODIST HOSPITAL

GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER

LII SHERMAN

DOES 1 TO 100

SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT, SHYH-MINE LII, M.D. TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF THOMAS R. BRADFORD, ESQ. IN IN SUPPORT

6/20/2018: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT, SHYH-MINE LII, M.D. TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF THOMAS R. BRADFORD, ESQ. IN IN SUPPORT

DEFENDANT AHMC GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, LP D/B/A GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER'S (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AND SERVED AS GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER) NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAI

7/6/2018: DEFENDANT AHMC GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, LP D/B/A GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER'S (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AND SERVED AS GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER) NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAI

Minute Order

7/23/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF TAKEING DEFENDANT GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTERS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OFF CALENDAR

8/3/2018: NOTICE OF TAKEING DEFENDANT GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTERS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OFF CALENDAR

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

8/10/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

12/17/2018: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Declaration

1/9/2019: Declaration

Declaration

3/12/2019: Declaration

Request for Judicial Notice

3/12/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Joinder

4/9/2019: Joinder

Ex Parte Application

5/24/2019: Ex Parte Application

Opposition

5/24/2019: Opposition

Declaration

5/24/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

5/24/2019: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/27/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

4/27/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY PURSUANT TO SECTION 375 OF THE CIVIL RULES OF COURT, JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION STANDARDS

5/7/2018: DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY PURSUANT TO SECTION 375 OF THE CIVIL RULES OF COURT, JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION STANDARDS

SUMMONS

2/14/2018: SUMMONS

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • Answer (to First Amended Complaint); Filed by Thomas Pero, M.D. [Doe 3] (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Thomas Pero, M.D. [Doe 3] (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for an order to continue defendant San Gabriel Valley Medical Center's motion for summary judgment hearing) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (PLAINTIFF?S EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING); Filed by Song Gao (Plaintiff); Ying Liu (Plaintiff); Geofrrey Gao (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Declaration (OF RAYMOND L. BLESSEY OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR THE CONTINUANCE OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING); Filed by San Gabriel Valley Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A CONTINUANCE OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING); Filed by San Gabriel Valley Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order to continue defe...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2018
  • DEFENDANT SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Song Gao (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Summons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Song Gao (Plaintiff); Ying Liu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC690061    Hearing Date: November 22, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Spring Street Courthouse, Department 5

song gao, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

san gabriel valley medical center, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC690061

Hearing Date: November 22, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Plaintiffs Song Gao, Ling Liu, and Geoffrey Gao (collectively, “Plaintiffs”) filed this action against Defendant Thomas Pero, M.D. (“Defendant”) for failing to diagnose Geoffrey Gao with spina bifida when Defendant treated Geoffrey for a fever. Plaintiffs have since dismissed all claims against Defendant except for Geoffrey Gao’s claim for medical malpractice. Defendant moves for summary judgment on Plaintiffs’ complaint, which Plaintiffs do not oppose. Defendant proffers a declaration from Joel Geiderman M.D. (“Geiderman”), a physician who specializes in emergency medicine who reviewed Geoffrey’s medical records, as well as discovery materials from this case. Geiderman opines that Defendant satisfied the appropriate standard of care. (Declaration of Joel Geiderman, M.D., ¶¶ 5-12.) This evidence is sufficient to satisfy Defendant’s burden, shifting the burden to Plaintiffs. Plaintiffs do not oppose the motion, and there is nothing in the record giving rise to a triable issue. Therefore, the motion for summary judgment is granted.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendant’s motion for summary judgment is granted. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: November 22, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court