This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 23:58:50 (UTC).

SOMAYEH BAGHERI VS AMIR SAEID ABOLGHASEMI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 SOMAYEH BAGHERI filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against AMIR SAEID ABOLGHASEMI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1753

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAGHERI SOMAYEH

Defendants

ABOLGHASEMI AMIR SAEID

WOODLAND HILLS GROCERY MARKET INC.

VENTURA PARADISE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEHTANI AANAND

Defendant Attorneys

SABZEVAR FARZAD MICHAEL

ROBISON CLINTON DAVIS

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/1/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

11/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/28/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/14/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Case Management Statement

8/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/26/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

8/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

6/25/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

6/11/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

6/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

6/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/13/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/26/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/30/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • Hearing02/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Somayeh Bagheri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Somayeh Bagheri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Aanand Mehtani (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Woodland Hills Grocery Market, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Amir Saeid Abolghasemi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Somayeh Bagheri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Somayeh Bagheri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Amir Saeid Abolghasemi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Somayeh Bagheri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Somayeh Bagheri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Somayeh Bagheri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Somayeh Bagheri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VENTURA PARADISE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WOODLAND HILLS GROCERY MARKET INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEHTANI AANAND