Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/13/2020 at 02:47:20 (UTC).

SOLTANI, KOBRA VS HELLER, SCOTT D

Case Summary

On 09/10/2019 SOLTANI, KOBRA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against HELLER, SCOTT D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LOPEZ-GISS, SUSAN and LEVANAS, MICHAEL I.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0314

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LOPEZ-GISS, SUSAN

LEVANAS, MICHAEL I.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SOLTANI KOBRA

Respondent

HELLER SCOTT D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ALLARD JANICEMARI

Respondent Attorney

MARSHALL BROOKS PATERSON

 

Court Documents

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

5/11/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

5/11/2020: Minute Order

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

9/10/2019: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

9/10/2019: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

9/10/2019: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

9/10/2019: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

9/10/2019: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

10/2/2019: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

10/2/2019: Minute Order

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

11/13/2019: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Nunc Pro Tunc Minute Order

11/13/2019: Nunc Pro Tunc Minute Order

Minute Order

11/13/2019: Minute Order

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

2/11/2020: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

2/11/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

3/27/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

3/27/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

4/20/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

4/20/2020: Minute Order

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F, Levanas, Michael I., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F, Levanas, Michael I., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F, Levanas, Michael I., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F, Lopez-Giss, Susan, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F, Lopez-Giss, Susan, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less