This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/08/2021 at 16:15:19 (UTC).

SOLOMON CLANTON VS MARRIOT INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Case Summary

On September 9, 2021, Solomon Clanton (hereinafter "Plaintiff" or “Mr. Clanton"), represented by Glotzer Joshua W. Esq., filed a personal injury lawsuit against Marriott International, Inc. and Does 1-25 (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking general and special damages for the injuries caused to the plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the Spring Street Courthouse.

 

In the complaint the plaintiff alleged that, “On or about October 13, 2019, Mr. Clanton had just checked into his room at the PREMISES when he attempted to plug in his cell phone into a socket in the guest room. As Mr. Clanton plugged the charger into the socket, he was severely electrocuted. The voltage and surge were so high that the lights in the room shorted out. Mr. Clanton was thrown backwards and to the ground and momentarily knocked out. Mr. Clanton suffered painful injuries as a result of Defendants liable conduct.”

 

The plaintiff further alleged that, “Each and every co-defendant, including Doe defendants, was acting as an employee, agent, ostensible agent, or co-conspirator with each and every other co-defendant or was otherwise acting within the course and scope of an employment relationship. Thus, all acts of each defendant are attributable to each other defendant, whether named or unnamed. Plaintiff is further informed, believes and thereon alleges that defendants, if any are incorporated or some other limited liability entity, that the principals of said entities have failed to carry out the business of such entities in accordance with corporate formalities.”

 

The plaintiff also alleged that, “Defendants, and each of them, including without limitation, their employees, co-workers, and others, owned, leased, occupied, controlled, possessed, supervised, inspected, leased, operated, maintained, and/or managed the PREMISES and area where the incident occurred and Plaintiff was injured on October 13, 2019. Defendants and each of them breached their duty and failed to use reasonable care to protect Plaintiff and others similarly situated from the foreseeable harm caused by the dangerous and unsafe condition of the premises. Defendants also failed to take reasonable steps to repair, replace, or give adequate warning of the dangerous and unsafe condition of the premises which Defendants and each of them created and/or failed to repair despite substantial time to take corrective action.”

 

There are two claims for relief laid down by the plaintiff. The first claim is for the alleged premises liability and the second claim is for the alleged negligence.

 

In its prayer for relief the plaintiff has requested the court for all special damages incurred by Plaintiff as a direct and proximate result of the incident complained of herein including but not limited to present and future medical expenses, property damages, lost present and future wages, loss of earning capacity and for general damages for pain, suffering, emotional distress, disruption to lifestyle and all other related damages in an amount according to proof at the time of trial along with such other and further relief as may be just and proper under the circumstances.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3270

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLANTON SOLOMON

Defendant

MARRIOT INTERNATIONAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLOTZER JOSHUA W. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/9/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2024
  • Hearing09/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • Hearing03/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • Hearing02/23/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Solomon Clanton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Solomon Clanton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Solomon Clanton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marriott International Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLOTZER JOSH