Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2020 at 17:37:32 (UTC).

SOLOMON BARNES VS LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 SOLOMON BARNES filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6335

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARNES SOLOMON

Defendants

BRAN JAVIER

FOSHAY LEARNING CENTER

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARPEL DONALD E.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/15/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/29/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2023
  • Hearing04/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • Hearing10/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Hearing10/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Solomon Barnes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Solomon Barnes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Solomon Barnes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARPEL DONALD E. ESQ.