This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/04/2023 at 08:45:26 (UTC).

SOLEDAD DELEON, ET AL. VS AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 SOLEDAD DELEON, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AIR LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2239

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DELEON SOLEDAD

DELEON RODEL

DELEON ROMMEL

DELEON RUEL

Defendants

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

CLA-VAL CO.

FLOWSERVE US INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

ITT CORPORATION

SYD CARPENTER MARINE CONTRACTOR INC.

THE WM. POWELL COMPANY

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

VIACOMCBS INC. FKA CBS CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO BF STURTEVANT

WARREN PUMPS LLC

WEIR VALVE & CONTROLS USA INC. FKA ATWOOD & MORRILL

ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY

FIREMAN?S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY

HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY

HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEITZ ANDREW LON

Defendant Attorneys

POWELL GLEN ROY

BARBA LUIS ALFONSO

LISTER JOHN

MILBRODT JEREMY D.

BROSAMLE ANTHONY DEAN

CALARESO CHRISTINE D.

DUFFY JOSEPH

NICHOLS STEPHEN M.

PIETRYKOWSKI MICHAEL J.

BERGSTROM EMILY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/30/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

11/28/2023: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

10/30/2023: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

10/30/2023: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

10/27/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

10/27/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

10/27/2023: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order Minute Order (Status Conference RE: Group (Frost Law Firm, PC))

10/25/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Status Conference RE: Group (Frost Law Firm, PC))

Minute Order Minute Order (Final Status Conference (De Leon-21STCV32239))

8/28/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Final Status Conference (De Leon-21STCV32239))

Notice (name extension) Notice of Resolution of Entire Action

8/25/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Resolution of Entire Action

Request for Dismissal

8/25/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

8/14/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

8/7/2023: Request for Dismissal

Notice (name extension) Defendant Warren Pumps, Llc, Notice Of Withdrawal Of Motion For Summary Judgment, Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication

8/3/2023: Notice (name extension) Defendant Warren Pumps, Llc, Notice Of Withdrawal Of Motion For Summary Judgment, Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication

Notice (name extension) Notice of Taking MSJ OFF-Calendar

7/31/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Taking MSJ OFF-Calendar

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

7/5/2023: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

6/21/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

6/21/2023: Request for Dismissal

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/30/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by Soledad Deleon, et al. on 08/31/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Soledad Deleon, Rodel Deleon, Rommel Deleon, and Ruel Deleon as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Soledad Deleon (Plaintiff); Rodel Deleon (Plaintiff); Rommel Deleon (Plaintiff); Ruel Deleon (Plaintiff); As to: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Defendant); Cla-Val Co. (Defendant); Flowserve US, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2023

DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Soledad Deleon (Plaintiff),Rommel Deleon (Plaintiff),Ruel Deleon (Plaintiff),Rodel Deleon (Plaintiff); Result: Entered

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees; by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Why Air & Liquid Systems and The WM Powell Company have not paid the settlement amounts past due (DELEON-21STCV32239) scheduled for 12/01/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 15 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/30/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2023

DocketStatus Conference Re: Group (Frost Law Firm, PC) scheduled for 05/15/2024 at 01:45 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 15 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/30/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2023

DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Rommel Deleon (Plaintiff),Rodel Deleon (Plaintiff),Soledad Deleon (Plaintiff),Ruel Deleon (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Result Date: 11/28/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees; by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by Soledad Deleon, et al. on 08/31/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Soledad Deleon, Rodel Deleon, Rommel Deleon, and Ruel Deleon as to Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Soledad Deleon (Plaintiff); Rodel Deleon (Plaintiff); Rommel Deleon (Plaintiff); Ruel Deleon (Plaintiff); As to: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
87 More Docket Entries
09/08/2021

DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2021

DocketUpdated -- Andrew Lon Seitz (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Frost Law Firm to Frost Law Firm, PC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2021

DocketAddress for Andrew Lon Seitz (Attorney) null

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2021

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Soledad Deleon (Plaintiff); As to: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2021

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Soledad Deleon (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2021

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2021

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2021

DocketCase assigned to Hon. David S. Cunningham in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2021

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Asbestos

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2021

DocketDeclaration of Soledad Deleon, Successor-in-Interest, Pursuant to C.C.P. Section 377.32; Filed by: Soledad Deleon (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less