Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2021 at 04:43:54 (UTC).

SOLARWORLD AMERICAS, INC. VS A1 SOLAR POWER INC.

Case Summary

On 07/10/2017 SOLARWORLD AMERICAS, INC filed an Other - Sister State Judgment lawsuit against A1 SOLAR POWER INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RALPH C. HOFER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0816

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Sister State Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RALPH C. HOFER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SOLARWORLD AMERICAS INC

Respondent

A1 SOLAR POWER INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STOEL RIVES LLP

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

7/10/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: SISTER STATE JUDGMENT

7/10/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: SISTER STATE JUDGMENT

Judgment

7/10/2017: Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments

7/20/2017: Notice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/24/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: SISTER STATE JUDGMENT

7/25/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: SISTER STATE JUDGMENT

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

12/27/2017: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

1/10/2018: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/9/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/9/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-02-09 00:00:00

2/9/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-02-09 00:00:00

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-03-23 00:00:00

3/23/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-03-23 00:00:00

APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER STATE JUDGEMENT -

7/10/2017: APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER STATE JUDGEMENT -

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department NCGD, Ralph C. Hofer, Presiding; Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng (AND ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT AS TOJUDGMENT DEBTOR YOSSI OHAYOUN,CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER OF A1SOLAR POWER INC.) - Off Calendar-Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-03-23 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department D; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department NCGD, Ralph C. Hofer, Presiding; Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng (AND ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT ASTO JUDGMENT DEBTOR YOSSI OHAYOUN,CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER OF A1SOLAR POWER INC.) - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (on A1 Solar Power Inc., ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (substitute service for Yossi Ohayoun, Judgment Debtor Not Valid ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-02-09 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketSister State Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER STATE JUDGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketApplication for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketDeclaration (OF BAO M. VU RE: ACCRUED INTEREST ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketJudgment (CORRECTED GENERAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITH MONEY AWARD AND SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketSister State Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by SOLARWORLD AMERICAS, INC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOLARWORLD AMERICAS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where A1 SOLAR POWER INC AKA DAVID MACK is a litigant