Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/04/2021 at 15:07:32 (UTC).

SOLAR SURGICAL CENTER, LLC VS NEWMED SOLUTIONS CORP. ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/12/2018 SOLAR SURGICAL CENTER, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NEWMED SOLUTIONS CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN J. KRALIK and SHIRLEY K. WATKINS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6720

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHN J. KRALIK

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SOLAR SURGICAL CENTER

SOLAR SURGICAL CENTER LLC

SOLAR SURGICAL CENTER LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED COMPANY

Defendants

DOES 1-10

MELNIKOV IGOR

NEWMED SOLUTIONS

GERSHMAN MASHA

NEWMED SOLUTIONS CORP.

MELLS GARY

DOES 1-10 INCLUSIVE

NEWMED SOLUTIONS CORP. DBA NEWMED SOLUTIONS

MELNIKOV IGOR AKA GARY MELLS

NEWMED SOLUTIONS CORP. AKA NEWMED SOLUTIONS

NEWMED SOLUTIONS CORP. A NEVADA CORPORATION AKA NEWMED SOLUTIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARIMIAN SHAHIN SHAWN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/12/2018: Complaint

Demand for Jury Trial -

8/7/2018: Demand for Jury Trial -

Request for Dismissal

2/8/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 150 ...)

11/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 150 ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS, INCLUDING DISMISSAL, S...) OF 09/11/2020

9/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS, INCLUDING DISMISSAL, S...) OF 09/11/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS, INCLUDING DISMISSAL, S...)

9/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS, INCLUDING DISMISSAL, S...)

Summons

8/7/2018: Summons

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

2/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF INTEREST

12/16/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF INTEREST

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT; OR...)

11/22/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT; OR...)

Request for Dismissal

10/23/2019: Request for Dismissal

Order for Publication

4/30/2019: Order for Publication

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

2/27/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

1/12/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-06-08 00:00:00

6/8/2018: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-06-08 00:00:00

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice -

9/28/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice -

Proof of Service - No Service -

9/27/2018: Proof of Service - No Service -

Proof of Service - No Service -

9/27/2018: Proof of Service - No Service -

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why sanctions in the amount of $150 should not be imposed against Plaintiff's counsel Shahin Shawn Karimian, for violating court order pursuant to CRC Rule 3.110(h), failure to enter default judgment) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Solar Surgical Center, LLC, a California limited company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Solar Surgical Center, LLC, a California limited company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by Solar Surgical Center, LLC, a California limited company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Plaintiff in Support of Request for Judgment); Filed by Solar Surgical Center, LLC, a California limited company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Solar Surgical Center, LLC, a California limited company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why sanctions in the amount of $150 should not be imposed against Plaintiff's counsel Shahin Shawn Karimian, for violating court order pursuant to CRC Rule 3.110(h), failure to enter default judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why sanctions in the amount of $150 s...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Why sanctions in the amount of $150 s...) of 01/08/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why sanctions in the amount of $ 150 should not be imposed against Plaintiff's counsel Shahin Shawn Karimian, for violating court order pursuant to CRC Rule 3.110(h), failure to enter default judgment,) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-06-08 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department T; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Solar Surgical Center, LLC, a California limited company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketSummons-Issued; Filed by Newmed Solutions Corp., a Nevada corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Solar Surgical Center, LLC, a California limited company (Plaintiff); Newmed Solutions Corp., a Nevada corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Solar Surgical Center, LLC, a California limited company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: LC106720    Hearing Date: July 29, 2020    Dept: T

Solar Surgical Center v Newmed

The request to enter default judgment was denied and notice provided to plaintiff on 1/30/20 for the following reason:

"There was no evidence submitted to support judgment against the individual defendants.  Please resubmit."

Since then, nothing has been resubmitted.  The court is inclined to set an OSC re dismissal for failure to prosecute.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARIMIAN SHAHIN