This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 05:17:30 (UTC).

SOLAIR WILSHIRE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS KOAR WILSHIRE W

Case Summary

On 07/13/2017 SOLAIR WILSHIRE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KOAR WILSHIRE W. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CAROLYN B. KUHL, BARBARA A. MEIERS and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8418

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CAROLYN B. KUHL

BARBARA A. MEIERS

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SOLAIR WILSHIRE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

KOAR WILSHIRE WESTERN LLC

ST. RESIDENTIAL LLC

WILSHIRE ENTERTAINMENT CENTER LLC

BOVIS LEND LEASE

SOLAIR MARKETING LLC

KOAR INSTITUTIONAL ADVISORS LLC

KIA WILWEST LLC

CORUS CONSTRUCTION VENTURE LLC

DOES 1 TO 400

DOES 1 THROUGH 400 INCLUSIVE

ST RESIDENTIAL LLC

Cross Defendants

ROES 1-100 INCLUSIVE

AMEC CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT INC. A

PAK CHRISTOPHER C. FOUNDER & PRINCIPAL

SOPREMA INC. A OHIO CORPORATION

JENSEN HUGHES INC. A MARYLAND CORP.

CHARLES PANKOW BUILDERS LTD. A CA.

DAVID EVANS AND ASSOCIATES INC. AN

MORRISON HERSHFIELD A DELAWARE CORP.

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

KANEDA JOSEPH

CRINELLA MARINO PETER

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

NORTON ROSE FULBRIGHT US LLP

LUCIA CHRISTIAN P.

LICHTMAN JOSHUA DAVID

FELDMAN IAN ROBERT ESQ.

ELKHOURY ANDREW

GILYARD JAMES GARRISON

DANIELE CHRISTINA NOELLE

NICHOLSON BARCLAY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LICHTMAN JOSHUA DAVID

KOELLER KEITH DOUGLAS

LUCIA CHRISTIAN PAUL

KOELLER DOUGLAS CHARLES

Other Attorneys

KEARL JANE GRILLIOT

SEGALL JORDAN DENTLER

MACDONALD MATTHEW ALEXANDER

RESURRECCION TREVOR OAKLEY

YOUNT LORI

BATES CHRISTOPHER PEYTON

COSTANZO TYLER MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Declaration

4/4/2019: Declaration

Declaration

4/4/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

4/11/2019: Minute Order

Opposition

5/10/2019: Opposition

Other -

3/5/2018: Other -

Notice of Continuance

3/14/2018: Notice of Continuance

Answer

4/11/2018: Answer

Other -

5/25/2018: Other -

Notice of Motion

1/14/2019: Notice of Motion

Motion to Compel Arbitration

3/1/2019: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Summons

1/12/2018: Summons

Cross-Complaint

1/12/2018: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

1/24/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

1/24/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Order

11/17/2017: Order

Notice of Continuance

10/24/2017: Notice of Continuance

Minute Order

9/26/2017: Minute Order

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

8/2/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

110 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • at 2:00 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Informal Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Quash (A Deposition Notice for PMK) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend (Bovis Lend Lease Cross-Complaint) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (Re-Setting Hearing Date on Bovis Lend Lease Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint); Filed by Bovis Lend Lease (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Bovis Lend Lease, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to File First Amended Cross- Complaint; Filed by Bovis Lend Lease (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Declaration (of Lori Yount Regarding Bovis Lend Lease, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to File First Amended Cross-Compliant); Filed by Bovis Lend Lease (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Opposition (Starline Windows Inc.'s to Bovis Lend Lease, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File First Amended Cross- Complaint); Filed by STARLINE WINDOWS INC., (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • RETURNED MAIL; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Notice of Ruling (; Notice of Entry of Case Management Order No. 2 and Final Status Conference Order); Filed by Solair Wilshire Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
212 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Solair Wilshire Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Solair Wilshire Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Complaint -FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Solair Wilshire Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Solair Wilshire Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. STRICT LIABILITY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less