This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2022 at 22:59:40 (UTC).

SOIRA PEREZ VS HCSG WEST, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 SOIRA PEREZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HCSG WEST, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7577

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREZ SOIRA

Defendants

HCSG WEST LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL

HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP INC. A CORPORATION

KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIM JACE HYUN

Defendant Attorney

VEAL CASSIDY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/13/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/18/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

11/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

11/30/2021: Request for Dismissal

Answer

11/29/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • Hearing02/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Soira Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Soira Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Soira Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Soira Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Soira Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Soira Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Soira Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HCSG WEST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALFIORNIA SPECIALTY CARE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING INC. is a litigant